Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Henry, Deborah Lynn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 24, 2020 |
CategoryDe - Decedent Estate Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH FINAL DISTRIBUTION | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PET AUTH MAKE FINAL DISTRIB | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CONSENT | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PET AUTH SELL REAL/PERS PROP | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.