Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Thomas, Justin, filed a(n) Cs - Custody case against Delk, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2022 |
CategoryCs - Custody |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | Hearing |
CUSTODY HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL MEANS | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PRE-TRIAL ORDER | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MTN INTERVENE | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION CITATION FOR CONTEMPT | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION CITATION/CONTEMPT | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.