Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilkerson, Vaqesha L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wilkerson, Keuntre Dequn, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Hearing |
FINAL DIVORCE HEARING
Judge: 10TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | WARNING ORDER ISSUED BY CLERK | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFF FOR WARN ORD SUBM W ORDER | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NON - EST. | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS - FILER PREPARED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.