Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Manes, Misty B, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DEFAULT | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.