Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Southern Bancorp Bank, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Knight, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION HEARING CANCELLED | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | BRIEF IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.