Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Arkansas Department Of Finance Administration, filed a(n) Rf - Register Arkansas Judgment- Cv case against Robertson, Vernell, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2022 |
CategoryRf - Register Arkansas Judgment- Cv |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GARNISHMENT DISMISSED | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GARNISHMENT | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FROM GARNISHEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.