Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Raper, Carrie, Raper, James, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-DISMISS RULE 41 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.