Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Barnett, Dawn C, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 09, 2022 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.