Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Simmons Bank, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Wilson, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Drew County, AR, . Drew County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2022 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDrew County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT-CONSENT | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
November 25, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 25, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.