Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Drainage District #5, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case in the jurisdiction of Desha County, AR, . Desha County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDesha County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - SCHEDULING ORDER | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.