Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Walker, Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Walker, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Conway County, AR, . Conway County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2015 |
CategoryDv - Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationConway County, AR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER/NOTICE INCOME WITHHOLD | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | MOD DIVORCE GRANTED | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.