Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bengston, Erin, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Morris, Shaun, in the jurisdiction of Conway County, AR, . Conway County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationConway County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER NAME CHANGE | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
February 16, 2021 | Hearing |
OTHER HEARING
Judge: 15TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | VIDEO ARGNMT HEARING CANCELLED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | OTHER HEARING SCHEDULED | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER SETTING COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.