Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Arkansas, filed a(n) Om - Civil - Other case against Triple R Bail Bonds Inc, Torres-Cruz, Pedro, in the jurisdiction of Conway County, AR, . Conway County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryOm - Civil - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationConway County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Hearing |
BOND FORFEITURE HEARING
Judge: 15TH CIRCUIT DIVISION 2 |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | BOND FORFEITURE HEARING SCHED | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE FAILED TO APPEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.