Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Office Child Support Enforcement, filed a(n) Ss - Support - Ocse case against Barr, David Allan Ray, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2023 |
CategorySs - Support - Ocse |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | OCSE WAGE NOTICE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.