Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carter, Lindsay M, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Parks, L Rodney,Jr, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PET ORDER OF PROTECTION | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.