Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Cox, James A, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2022 |
CategoryOc - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISS | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD DISMISSED | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION EXTEND SERVICE TIME | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.