Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alexander, Austin David, Alexander, Carley Claire, Shelton, Carley Claire, filed a(n) Da - Order Of Protection case against Alexander, Austin David, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryDa - Order Of Protection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOD CONSOLIDATED | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION CONTINUANCE | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.