Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Do - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) case against Mckay, Teresa Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, AR, . Clay County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2017 |
CategoryDo - Seller Plaintiff (Debt Coll.) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClay County, AR |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CV COMPLAINT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.