Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Kingery, Melissa Ann, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2008 |
CategoryMotion For Enforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeOrder To Revoke Probation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Supplemental Order | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Recess Order | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Order/Notice to Withhold Income for Child Support | |
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Recess Order | |
September 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Child Support Payment | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.