Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chavez, Michael, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Investments Llc, Terrafirm, represented by The Resendez Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Hackenberg, Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHackenberg, Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Communication | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Case Disposed CANCELED Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hackenberg, Stacy) Case Disposed |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Mailed | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Mailed Notice of Hearing | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Mailed | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.