Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cedar Park Health System, L.P. D B A Cedar Park Regional Medical Center, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Christopher R Deloney, against Shoaff, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Williams, Angela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Granting Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Dismissed by Plaintiff CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Angela) Dismissed by Plaintiff |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Non -Suit | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Set | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Awaiting Pre-Trial Hearing | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Received | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Due | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Shoaff, Melissa Served 06/20/2022 Returned 07/01/2022 | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Defendant 1 | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | E-Filed Initiating Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.