Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Madan, Gaurav, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Richard Cahan, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts JP2.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2024 |
CategoryEvictions |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Williams, Angela) | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | E-Filed Initiating Document | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Tucker, Amanda Served 03/18/2024 Returned 03/19/2024 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Defendant 1 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Bond Approval | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial Date Set | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Immediate Possession Bond Filed | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Tucker, Amanda Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.