Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Bailey, Victoria filed a(n) Determination Of Heirship case in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #4.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2024 |
CategoryDetermination Of Heirship |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #4 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting Returned | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation by Posting Served | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation by Publication Returned | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation by Publication Served | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation on Application to Determine Heirship | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Publication Citation Chapa, Geneva Gonzales Unserved | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Publication Citation posted w/OCA Unknown Heirs Served 04/09/2024 Returned 04/11/2024 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Issued and E-mailed | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Application for Determination of Heirship | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Posting Citation Chapa, Geneva Gonzales Served 04/11/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.