Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Superior Bank Fsb N K A Superior Federal Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Carole Houghton, against Contreras, Janie, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Carnes, Burt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2002 |
CategoryAccounts, Contracts, Notes |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2003 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
November 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
November 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
November 12, 2002 | Docket Event | Non Military Affidavit | |
September 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Writ of Sequestration Issued | |
September 27, 2002 | Docket Event | Bond | |
August 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Order for Issuance | |
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Citation Contreras, Janie Served 10/11/2002 Response Due 11/04/2002 | |
July 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 18, 2002 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Vol./Book , Page Vol./Book , Page |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.