Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kelly, Carol Anita, filed a(n) case against Kelly, Lawrence Edward, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Michael P. Jergins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Jergins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2002 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2002 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Setting (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Jergins, Michael P.) | |
May 28, 2002 | Docket Event | Deposition Certificate | |
May 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
May 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Second Amended Petition | |
May 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Special Exceptions | |
May 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Original Counter-Petition | |
May 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
April 30, 2002 | Docket Event | First Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.