Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Austin Community College, Leander Independent School District, The City Of Cedar Park, Texas, The County Of Williamson, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Craig Morgan, against Aranda, Pablo, Sr., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Larson, Ryan D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarson, Ryan D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Tax Case (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Larson, Ryan D., Jergins, Michael P.) | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.