Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hunter, Thomas Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dush, Katrina Eve, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting New Trial - Reopens case for OCA | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry by Judge Betsy Lambeth | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion for New Trial (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for New Trial | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.