Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mcewan, Patricia Dawn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Crawson, John, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Ryan D. Larson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing on Default Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.