Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jackson, Stacy Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zoch, Sidney Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Bureau of Vital Statistics Form | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.