Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Forest Oaks Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Other - Civil case represented by Gregory S Cagle, against Black, Nicole S., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Lambeth, Betsy F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther - Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Judgment | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Substituted Service | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Substituted Service | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Black, Nicole S. Served 05/22/2021 Returned 05/27/2021 | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.