Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Horner, Angala Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Horner, Keith Alan, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Income Withholding for Support Order (IWO) | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment E-mailed | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.