Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Elizabeth Galvez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Villanueva, John David, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment E-mailed | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Evidence | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.