Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estates At Settler'S Park Owners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Connie N Heyer, against Occupant Of Property, represented by David Rogers, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryForeclosure - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Quiroz, Javier Served 01/15/2020 Occupant of Property Served 01/15/2020 | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified Mail Quiroz, Javier Served 01/15/2020 Occupant of Property Served 01/15/2020 | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Application (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.