Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tumlinson, Jaclyn Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Priem, Lora Irene Served 05/14/2018 Returned 05/17/2018 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.