Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcadams, Shawn Renee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dennis, Steven Troy, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 27, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Case Settled CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) Case Settled 10/16/2018 Continued to 01/04/2019 - Court - McAdams, Shawn Renee |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Subpoena(s) Issued by Attorney | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion for Continuance (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.