Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shaw, Lea Anne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation Setta, John Joseph Served 05/05/2018 Returned 05/07/2018 | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Issuance | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.