Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nevett, Liberty, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nevett, Daniel G., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal For Want of Prosecution | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket Notice Mailed | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.