Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miranda, Ofelia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Ryan D. Larson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryProtective Orders - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Protective Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Protective Order (OCA) | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Return Mail | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Extended Temp Ex Parte Protection Order (no OCA) | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Extended Temp Ex Parte Protection Order (no OCA) | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Extended Temp Ex Parte Protection Order (no OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.