Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fuentes, Rebekah Macrae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Atty General as Necessary Party & Change of Payee | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.