Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-3, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Huddleston, Lacy R, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Final Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing By Order CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) By Order |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Setting and DWOP Notice | |
July 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Entry by Judge Betsy Lambeth | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Huddleston, Lacy R Served 12/29/2017 Returned 03/29/2018 | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.