Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roddin, Emma, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roddin, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Ryan D. Larson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRyan D. Larson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Enter Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Allowing Attorney to Withdraw | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Withdraw (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing on Motion to Enter Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.