Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barrios, Greg Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barrios, Brandi A, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Ryan D. Larson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRyan D. Larson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal For Want of Prosecution | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket Notice Mailed | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Substituting Counsel | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Unsigned Order | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Larson, Ryan D.) | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (non OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.