Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bohn, Jr., Kevin L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Employers Order To Withhold Income | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Employer Letter | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Withholding from Earnings for Child Support | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation Bohn, Melissa Served 12/27/2014 Returned 12/29/2014 | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.