Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harness, Vicki Lynn, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Almour, Ralph, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce (No Children) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Final Decree Mailed to Respondent | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing By Order CANCELED Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) By Order 05/11/2015 Reset by Court to 05/28/2015 |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Mediated Settlement Agreement | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Vacation | |
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.