Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against De Oliveira, Ulisses S, Blaney De Oliveira, Shama J, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Establishment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Affecting Parent-Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Bill of Costs | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Affecting Parent Child Relationship | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Arrington, Tamera S.) | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation De Oliveira, Ulisses S Served 01/15/2015 Returned 01/21/2015 Blaney De Oliveira, Shama J Served 01/16/2015 Returned 01/21/2015 | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Original Petition - AG (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.