Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Whitethorn, Marielle Lopes, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Whitethorn, Joshua Jon, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Betsy F. Lambeth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Decree Of Divorce | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Unsigned Order | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Withholding from Earnings for Child Support | |
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lambeth, Betsy F.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.