Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Calpers, Mclean, Tina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mclean, Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 02, 2009 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions743 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time743 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Regarding Payment of Support (FL-632) | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawl of Attorney | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order 913520-Stipulation and Order Filed/Issued By: 931220 - Attorney for Petitioner STIPULATION AND ORDER [913520] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER [931220] |
|
September 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing 915310-Hearing: Review; McLean, T. vs. McLean, D. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : Time Share Records Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order 914210-Order Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service ORDER [914210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Other Hearing 916910-Hearing: Other; McLean, T. vs. McLean, D. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : Issue of 2010 Temp Order Judge: Williams, Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.