Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
**Confidential** filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Martinez, Julio Cesar, Burke, April Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
Category(Title Iv-D Oag Use Only) Enforcement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Order | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge's Docket Entry | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Capias Review Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Baardsen, Dawn, Arrington, Tamera S.) | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Capias Review Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Baardsen, Dawn, Arrington, Tamera S.) | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Bill of Costs | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Enforcing Child Support | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
May 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.