Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shook, Sherry, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John W Ragland, against Vaughan, Lester A, represented by Michael L Fox, Lamar G Clemons, in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts with Burt Carnes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2010 |
CategoryDamage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Settlement Agreement | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
February 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
September 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Opinion of Court of Appeals | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Copy of Letter | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter From Court of Appeals | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Supplement(al) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.