Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holden, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Holder, Pamela L., in the jurisdiction of Williamson County, TX, . Williamson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWilliamson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Storage Box | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Divorce (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Silverstone, Mark J.) | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Mailed | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Jury Demand | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Counter-Petition | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Respondent's Original Answer | |
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.